California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB557 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/10/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 557ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 1, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 22, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee (Coauthor: Assembly Member Ma) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 236.3 to the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 557, Yee. Human trafficking: property: nuisance. Existing law defines human trafficking as the deprivation or violation of the personal liberty of another person with the intent to commit certain specified sex offenses with the person or to obtain forced labor or services, as specified. This bill would provide that upon conviction for the offense of human trafficking involving real property that is used to facilitate the commission of an offense involving illegal gambling, lewdness, assignation, or prostitution, that real property is authorized to be declared and treated as a nuisance, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 236.3 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 236.3. Upon conviction of a violation of Section 236.1, when real property is used to facilitate the commission of the offense and the offense involves illegal gambling, lewdness, assignation, or prostitution, the procedures for determining whether the property constitutes a nuisance and the remedies imposed therefor as provided in Article 2 (commencing with Section 11225) of Chapter 3 of Title 1 of Part 4 shall apply.