02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |