07/01/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
05/21/2009 | To Com. on AGRI. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 829.) To Assembly. | |||
05/06/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/05/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 582.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on F. & A. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |