|
08/30/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 6.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. (May 20 amended measure version corrected May 24.)
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1194.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 679.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 479.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|