04/30/2009 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/29/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6. Page 728.) | |||
04/28/2009 | Set for hearing April 29. | |||
04/27/2009 | Joint Rule 62 (a), file notice suspended. (Page 647.) | |||
04/22/2009 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 636.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |