02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
08/24/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
08/19/2009 | Set for hearing August 25. | |||
07/06/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/03/2009 | Set for hearing July 8. | |||
07/02/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
06/29/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/21/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/31/2009 | Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/24/2009 | Set for hearing March 31. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |