California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB571 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 571CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 597 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 24, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 16, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 28, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Maldonado FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 3724.32 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 571, Maldonado. Geothermal resources. Existing law imposes a civil penalty on an oil or gas well operator when a violation of geothermal regulations has occurred. Existing law requires the State Oil and Gas Supervisor to investigate complaints against a well and, when necessary, to issue an order to the well operator stating the work required to repair the damage complained of. Existing law also requires the supervisor to establish an annual well fee, and penalties for late payment. This bill would authorize the supervisor to deny approval of proposed well operations until the operator pays the civil penalty, complies with the order, or pays the required well fee. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3724.32 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 3724.32. When an operator fails to pay a civil penalty imposed pursuant to Section 3754.5, comply with an order of the supervisor issued pursuant to this chapter, or pay a charge assessed under Section 3724.5, the supervisor may deny approval of the operator's proposed well operations until the operator pays the civil penalty, complies with the order of the supervisor, or pays the charge assessed under Section 3724.5.