|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2450.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 706.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|