|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Heard in committee on June 21.)
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3043.) Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1169.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1026.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 478.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on G.O. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|