California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB588 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 10/11/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 588CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 191 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 11, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 11, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 3, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 3, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Public Safety (Senators Leno (Chair), Benoit, Cedillo, Hancock, Huff, Steinberg, and Wright) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to repeal Section 9003 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 588, Committee on Public Safety. Sex Offender Management Board. Existing law establishes the Sex Offender Management Board, as specified, under the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. The purpose of the board is to address issues, concerns, and problems related to the community management of the state's adult sex offenders, with a goal of safer communities and reduced victimization. Existing law requires the board to conduct a thorough assessment of current management practices for adult sex offenders and to submit a report to the Legislature on that assessment. Under existing law, the board is also required to develop recommendations to improve management practices for those offenders, as specified, and the provisions creating the board remain effective only until January 1, 2010. This bill would delete the repeal date of January 1, 2010, thereby making those provisions operative indefinitely. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9003 of the Penal Code is repealed.