01/15/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 2665.) | |||
12/17/2009 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
12/15/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 703.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/02/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |