02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/11/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
01/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
01/06/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |