|
11/02/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/20/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2524.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2455.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2455.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3067.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 2922.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on B. & P. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1188.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 20.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 676.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|