02/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2009. | |||
02/20/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
02/19/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
02/19/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
02/19/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 358.) Read second time. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 359.) To Senate. | |||
02/19/2009 | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 166.) Read second time. Read third time. Amended. (Page 167.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 167.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 169.) To Assembly. | |||
02/18/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
12/02/2008 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |