06/22/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1101.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
04/27/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 498.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |