|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6832.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6624.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. On HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6430.) To third reading. (August 20 amended measure version corrected August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 398.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|