07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/23/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
06/18/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 16. Page 2177.) To Senate. | |||
06/17/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |||
05/28/2009 | To Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 886.) To Assembly. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 683.) | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |