05/21/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 3. Page 1610.) To Senate. | |||
05/18/2009 | Unanimous consent granted to consider without reference to committee or file. Read second time. Amended. Placed on third reading. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 508.) To Assembly. | |||
04/02/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |