02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/21/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |