|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2914.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on W.,P. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1188.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 684.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|