|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2119.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2820.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 622.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 807.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|