02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/29/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/11/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/05/2009 | Set for hearing June 10. | |||
06/04/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/27/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on T. & H. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |