|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2022.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2714.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 676.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27 in B., P. & E.D. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|