|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2390.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 898.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 805.)
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 581.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|