01/19/2010 | Stricken from Senate file. | |||
10/11/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |||
10/11/2009 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
09/25/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |||
08/31/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/31/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2817.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
05/26/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1013.) To Assembly. | |||
05/21/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/20/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 875.) | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |