02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 681.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on V.A. and G.O. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |