California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB649 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/04/2009

 BILL NUMBER: SB 649AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ashburn FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 649, as amended, Ashburn. Transportation. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of the state highway system and associated property. Existing law authorizes the department to sell real property that is no longer necessary for highway purposes. This bill would require the Department of Transportation to transfer  , for fair market value, on or before June 30, 2010,  ownership of a specified  portion of a  parcel of land in Kern County acquired for the Mojave Bypass to the East Kern Airport District for open-space purposes. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1.  The   On or before June 30, 2010, the  Department of Transportation shall transfer  , for fair market value,  ownership of 577 acres known as Site A of the Mojave Bypass property in Kern County  , except for that portion of the property constituting the right-of-way for State Highway Route 14,  to the East Kern Airport District for open-space purposes.