BILL NUMBER: SB 649CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 59 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 26, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 4, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 2, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Ashburn FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 649, Ashburn. Transportation. Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of the state highway system and associated property. Existing law authorizes the department to sell real property that is no longer necessary for highway purposes. This bill would require the Department of Transportation to transfer, for fair market value, on or before June 30, 2010, ownership of a specified portion of a parcel of land in Kern County acquired for the Mojave Bypass to the East Kern Airport District for open-space purposes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. On or before June 30, 2010, the Department of Transportation shall transfer, for fair market value, ownership of 577 acres known as Site A of the Mojave Bypass property in Kern County, except for that portion of the property constituting the right-of-way for State Highway Route 14, to the East Kern Airport District for open-space purposes.