|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2271.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1174.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 728.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|