02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/02/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2009 | Set for hearing June 9. | |||
05/26/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/07/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Set for hearing May 6. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |