|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1175.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. (Received by Desk on May 29 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(5).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 584.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|