|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2447.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 924.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 706.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|