|
10/19/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/19/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2516.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 2448.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Ducheny. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2448.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 3339.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3039.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 510.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|