02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/06/2010 | Set for hearing January 12. Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
05/12/2009 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/29/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/02/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |