|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 5108.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6930.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 27.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6774.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6424.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5645.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 2729.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 676.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 397.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on ED. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|