|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2371.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 3126.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 3126.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Caballero.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1110.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 684.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|