02/01/2010 | Died on Senate inactive file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 19. Page 1199.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1199.) Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Pavley. | |||
06/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 684.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
04/01/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |