07/08/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on INS. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 969.) To Assembly. | |||
04/21/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
04/14/2009 | Set for hearing April 20. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 396.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on B., F. & I. Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |