01/19/2010 | Stricken from Senate file. | |||
11/04/2009 | Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2555.) | |||
11/02/2009 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
11/02/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3581.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3582.) To Senate. | |||
09/02/2009 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |||
09/01/2009 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian. | |||
08/17/2009 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/11/2009 | Placed on second reading file. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 511.) To Assembly. | |||
04/01/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/22/2009 | Read first time. | |||
01/21/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |||
01/20/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |