02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/11/2010 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/08/2010 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
12/15/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/23/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 610.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |