|
08/31/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6872.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6426.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Saldana.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1186.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 676.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|