California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill June 3, 2010
Bill September 1, 2009
Bill June 17, 2009
Bill June 9, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009