|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Re-referred to Com. On RULES pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6438.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1168.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 699.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|