LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB702
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB702
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB702
Compare Versions
SB702 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB702 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB702 Amended September 1, 2009
SB702 Amended June 26, 2009
SB702 Amended May 5, 2009
SB702 Amended April 20, 2009
SB702 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB702 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB702 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB702 Amended September 1, 2009
SB702 Amended June 26, 2009
SB702 Amended May 5, 2009
SB702 Amended April 20, 2009
SB702 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare