|
02/01/2010
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 730.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|