|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2365.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 3112.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 2823.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1002.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 875.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|