|
03/01/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 894.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 808.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 585.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|