06/15/2009 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/01/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1111.) To Assembly. | |||
05/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1074.) Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 755.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Coms. on EQ. and APPR. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |