02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 707.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/16/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/19/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |