|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 341, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2367.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 3073.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 512.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|